WESTCLIFF JEWISH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1174287
Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 201 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 201 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 June 2020 354 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 18 June 2020 354 days late Download