Accounts and annual returns ST PETER'S MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 1175949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window