FEEDING FUTURES

Charity number: 1174796
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 23 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 11 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 23 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 27 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 27 August 2018 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)