Financial history TIMPERLEY (RIDDINGS) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 510939
Charity reporting is overdue by 1645 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2004 31/10/2005 31/10/2006 31/10/2007 31/10/2008
Total gross income £7.33k £5.94k £4.94k £5.86k £5.57k
Total expenditure £6.99k £7.75k £5.08k £6.78k £7.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A