BLAENAU RECREATION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 511095
Charity reporting is overdue by 1271 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2012 30/06/2013 30/06/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2016
Total gross income £300 £300 £1.21k £915 £1.34k
Total expenditure £750 £612 £629 £338 £338
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A