BRAMBLEBROOK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 511215
Charity reporting is up to date (179 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £23.24k £37.81k £31.61k £28.64k £28.64k
Total expenditure £25.74k £37.88k £28.71k £27.93k £27.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.24k £0 £0 N/A N/A