DARNALL, ATTERCLIFFE AND TINSLEY IN CONTACT

Charity number: 511222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £39.48k £31.39k £29.76k £39.78k £39.12k
Total expenditure £33.96k £30.99k £32.00k £34.70k £31.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A