THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE DIVINE, SELSDON

Charity number: 1175943
Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FIONA MARGARET MCSORLEY Trustee 27 September 2020 None on record
JANE ELIZABETH GUGLIELMI Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
LESLEY OLWEN TAYLOR Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
DEBORAH ANN BROWN Trustee 27 September 2020 None on record
JUDITH CLARE COLEMAN Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
ANN CROCOMBE Trustee 27 September 2020 None on record
GILLIAN MARGARET SHARPE Trustee 27 September 2020 None on record
ALICE VALERIE HICKS Trustee 02 April 2017 None on record
DR ROBIN THEODORE ORCHARD Trustee 27 April 2014 None on record
GRAHAM JENNINGS Trustee 22 April 2018 None on record
JOANNA RACHEL FLORENCE SANDS Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
IAN RICHARD BRENTNALL Trustee 23 April 2021 None on record
DARA CATHERINE CYNTHIA SMITH Trustee 07 April 2019 None on record
HELEN ELIZABETH LISHMUND Trustee 27 April 2014
CONTACT: SELSDON CHURCHES NEIGHBOURHOOD CARE Received: On time
ANDREW IAN HICKS Trustee 02 April 2017 None on record
MARTYN JOHN BROWN Trustee 27 September 2020 None on record
GILLIAN ROSEMARY SALTER Trustee 27 September 2020 None on record