THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE DIVINE, SELSDON

Charity number: 1175943
Charity reporting is overdue by 37 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 November 2021 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 37 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 December 2020 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 December 2020 31 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download