CONNECT

Charity number: 511328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required