Financial history CONNECT

Charity number: 511328
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.30k £1.95k £1.11k £12.43k £7.22k
Total expenditure £6.08k £2.08k £4.51k £12.79k £8.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A