Accounts and annual returns 1ST HEATON MOOR SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1178535
Charity reporting is overdue by 166 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 166 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 166 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 November 2022 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 November 2022 26 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 March 2022 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 March 2022 149 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 March 2021 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 March 2021 143 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 March 2020 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 March 2020 142 days late Download Open in new window