Trustees 1ST HEATON MOOR SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1178535
Charity reporting is overdue by 164 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Guy Chair 28 September 2023
1ST/4TH REDDISH SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Dawn Susan Keogh Trustee 19 February 2024
None on record
ANDREW ARNOLD Trustee 16 November 2023
None on record
Amy Arnold Trustee 09 November 2023
None on record
Kylie Raynor Trustee 09 November 2023
None on record
Dr Melanie Haisley Trustee 07 July 2020
None on record