HAWKWELL VILLAGE U3A

Charity number: 1178118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 08 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 24 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required