HAWKWELL VILLAGE U3A

Charity number: 1178118
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jackie Ford Trustee 22 April 2021 None on record
Carol Silverman Trustee 25 April 2018 None on record
Andrea Johnson Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record
Karen Sutton Trustee 22 April 2021 None on record
LIN PURKISS Trustee 01 May 2013 None on record
TONI LORRAINE NEOBARD Chair 01 May 2013 None on record
William Neobard Trustee 25 April 2019 None on record
Kate Broad Trustee 24 April 2019 None on record
Brian Pickard Trustee 22 April 2021 None on record
Jane Adams Trustee 22 April 2021 None on record
Coral Kathro Trustee 25 April 2018 None on record