Accounts and annual returns THE CITY OF COVENTRY CORPS OF DRUMS

Charity number: 511615
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 111 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 111 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required