Financial history THE CITY OF COVENTRY CORPS OF DRUMS

Charity number: 511615
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £38.77k £18.68k £20.22k £4.13k £5.50k
Total expenditure £33.98k £26.35k £21.89k £7.78k £7.24k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A