Trustees NORTH CORNWALL RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING

Charity number: 1177325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark David Cunliffe Chair 01 March 2014
None on record
Alyson Judith MOODY Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
John William Tilley Trustee 01 March 2015
None on record
Jennifer Ann Oakley Trustee 01 July 2014
None on record
MARGARET ELISABETH CUNLIFFE Trustee 01 March 2014
None on record
TRACEY JANE DROWNE Trustee 03 January 2014
None on record
DIANA MARION LARKIN Trustee 01 September 2013
THE DOC MARTIN FUND
Received: On time
CONCERN WADEBRIDGE
Received: On time
KIM NICOLA BUTLER Trustee 01 November 2009
None on record