Accounts and annual returns NORTH CORNWALL RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING

Charity number: 1177325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 22 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 22 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 13 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 19 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 16 July 2020 46 days late Download Open in new window