Financial history THE SPARKHILL TRUST

Charity number: 511666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £10.05k £9.53k £9.33k £9.11k £8.39k
Total expenditure £7.50k £7.40k £6.73k £8.82k £4.02k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A