Accounts and annual returns GLOBAL HEALTH FILM INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1179829
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 24 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 24 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 29 October 2019 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 29 October 2019 59 days late Download Open in new window