FRIENDS OF ST. JAMES PARK

Charity number: 1177957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 05 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 05 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 25 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 25 November 2019 On time Download