Accounts and annual returns MACHEN RECREATION CIO

Charity number: 1178254
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 04 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 June 2020 151 days late Download Open in new window