Trustees ACTIVE OXFORDSHIRE
Charity number: 1179040

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Longworth | Chair | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carl Davis | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Messenger | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Magill | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leanne James | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Rees | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Yemi Magara | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Hamp | Trustee | 31 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dean Woodman | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Pearce Higgins | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.