Trustees AASHA ENGLAND

Charity number: 1179464
Charity reporting is overdue by 77 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr SIVASUNDAR LAL RAJESH Chair 15 October 2011
None on record
Nidhi Bindal Dhir Trustee 10 December 2022
None on record
Natarajan Saravanappa Trustee 11 November 2018
None on record
Dr VISHNU MACHINENI Trustee 15 November 2017
None on record
SANDEEP KONDURU Trustee 15 October 2011
None on record
Dr VASANTHAPRIYA SELVARAJ Trustee 21 May 2011
None on record
VEERA RAGHAVAN GUDIMETLA Trustee 26 April 2008
None on record