Accounts and annual returns CLWYD FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY (CYMDEITHAS HANES TEULUOEDD CLWYD)

Charity number: 512068
Charity reporting is overdue by 937 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 207 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 207 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 31 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 03 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 937 days
Annual return 31 January 2020 30 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 22 May 2020 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required