Financial history SEVERN HOSPICE LIMITED

Charity number: 512394
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £12.91m £13.01m £12.91m £13.22m £13.61m
Total expenditure £11.35m £12.11m £12.33m £11.82m £12.85m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.65m £3.80m £3.71m £7.81m £3.95m
Income - Donations and legacies £4.37m £4.09m £4.01m £2.76m £4.08m
Income - Other trading activities £4.62m £4.80m £4.86m £2.42m £5.26m
Income - Charitable activities £3.65m £3.80m £3.71m £3.95m £4.00m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £205.09k £221.05k £245.84k £166.04k £188.95k
Income - Other £65.47k £104.14k £75.46k £3.93m £86.69k
Income - Legacies £2.86m £2.37m £1.82m £1.04m £2.39m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.30m £8.72m £8.80m £8.61m £8.94m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.05m £3.39m £3.53m £3.21m £3.91m
Expenditure - Governance £70.94k £91.45k £82.16k £107.74k £109.57k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £42.09k £36.78k £41.91k £42.97k £51.92k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0