Trustees SEVERN HOSPICE LIMITED
Charity number: 512394

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Allan Gold | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew James Clarkson | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Andrew Bleakley | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Debra Towse | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Ashley Fraser | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Therese Whitford | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Coackley | Trustee | 09 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MARCUS WARDLE | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|||||
JUDITH BEARD | Trustee | 04 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Declan Ryan | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|||||
Paul Donohue | Trustee | 31 July 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.