WILSHAW VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 512468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 01 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 12 February 2020 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 27 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 07 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required