Accounts and annual returns COUNT EVERYONE IN

Charity number: 1181852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2022 14 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 14 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 20 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 20 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 26 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 26 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window