Financial history BACKWORTH RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 512684
Charity reporting is overdue by 1024 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017
Total gross income £3.23k £1.93k £5.03k £2.98k £4.96k
Total expenditure £3.39k £2.32k £2.36k £2.24k £4.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A