Financial history 1ST HOUGHTON (ST MICHAELS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 512697
Charity reporting is overdue by 32 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £10.66k £8.86k £6.75k £13.41k £63.13k
Total expenditure £11.59k £8.95k £6.84k £9.79k £72.05k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k £58.96k