Trustees SWANLAND VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1180273
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Page Chair 27 October 2020
None on record
Rebecca Louise Feetam Trustee 11 October 2023
None on record
Dr Mie Mie Kyaing Trustee 09 February 2023
None on record
David Walker Trustee 01 August 2022
None on record
Christine Walker Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Leah Moore Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Elaine Holmes Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Michelle Johns Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
David Charles Evans Trustee 16 August 2021
None on record
Allan Quarterman Trustee 01 May 2021
None on record
Neil Bowerman Trustee 20 November 2020
KINGSTON UPON HULL AND EAST RIDING GROUP OF ADVANCED MOTORISTS
Received: On time
Christine Patricia Page Trustee 27 October 2020
None on record