Trustees OXTON & PRENTON DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1179657
Charity reporting is overdue by 144 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carole Lapping Trustee 20 July 2023
None on record
Pamela Southall Trustee 20 July 2023
None on record
Pauline Horner Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record
Margaret Cullen Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record
Brian Jones Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record
Alan Harding Trustee 25 April 2019
None on record
ELIANE DAVIE Trustee 27 April 2017
None on record
MR ANTHONY SWARBRICK Trustee 26 April 2017
None on record
KENNETH MICHAEL JACKSON Trustee 28 April 2016
None on record