Governing document LIVERPOOL AND SOUTH WEST LANCASHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity number: 512906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/06/1982 AS AMENDED ON 11/11/1989 AS AMENDED ON 26/10/1991 AS AMENDED ON 24/01/1993 AS AMENDED ON 19/04/1998 AS AMENDED ON 04/10/2006 AS AMENDED ON 15/10/2011 as amended on 16 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY OF FAMILY HISTORY AND GENEALOGY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
THE PART OF LANCASHIRE KNOWN AS THE HUNDRED OF WEST DERBY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.