Trustees LIVERPOOL AND SOUTH WEST LANCASHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity number: 512906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Belinda Shaw | Trustee | 25 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Whitehead | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Anyon | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Atkins | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Agnes Ingram | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Barry Peacock | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shelagh Boardman | Trustee | 15 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.