Accounts and annual returns HEBDEN BRIDGE AND DISTRICT OLD PEOPLES WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 513082
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 February 2022 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required