Financial history HEBDEN BRIDGE AND DISTRICT OLD PEOPLES WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 513082
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.50k £5.00k £1.24k £12.80k £21.45k
Total expenditure £0 £5.37k £5.85k £3.07k £24.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.30k N/A