Trustees LEUKAEMIA CARE

Charity number: 1183890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Ranulph George Matthews-Maxwell Chair 01 February 1999
HUMANKIND CHARITY
Received: On time
Helen Knight Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
Professor Mhairi Copland Trustee 02 February 2022
None on record
Dr Sarah Ann Smith Trustee 02 February 2022
None on record
Carina Patterson Trustee 03 November 2021
None on record
Robert Heppell Trustee 16 December 2020
None on record
Dharmesh Mehta Trustee 16 December 2020
None on record
Kate Stallard Trustee 26 September 2018
None on record
Elizabeth Jane Wilson Trustee 26 September 2018
None on record
Dr Emmanouil Nikolousis Trustee 23 November 2016
None on record
Wendy Jane DAVIES Trustee 03 October 2012
None on record