Financial history WORLD FRIENDSHIP

Charity number: 513643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £20.51k £20.94k £21.41k £21.96k £21.65k
Total expenditure £14.12k £32.23k £24.13k £17.93k £19.07k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A