Trustees WORLD FRIENDSHIP

Charity number: 513643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr James Robert Sydney Wrightson Trustee 22 November 2022
None on record
Dr Anil Kumar Mondru Trustee 05 May 2022
None on record
Dr Paul Martin Strickland Trustee 29 May 2021
ST BEDE WITH ST CLEMENT TOXTETH
Received: On time
Pauline Joy Addy Trustee 02 May 2019
None on record
Dr Liyanaarachchige Sanjeevani Ranjana Perera BA PhD Trustee 23 May 2016
None on record
REV CANON PHILIP GREGORY ANDERSON Trustee 11 July 2012
THE BISPHAM CHARITIES
Received: On time
MR R H ARDEN Trustee
THE ROSEMARY CHARITY LIVERPOOL
Received: On time
MR JIM HUTHWAITE Trustee
None on record
DR F J RAYNER Trustee
None on record
MRS E J RAYNER Trustee
None on record
MISS P M JAMES Trustee
None on record