LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF ST MONICA'S HOSPITAL

Charity number: 513694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £31.36k £26.70k £115.02k £15.76k £169.31k
Total expenditure £12.10k £14.58k £95.42k £24.07k £42.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A