Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF CARLTON DIGBY SCHOOL

Charity number: 513751
Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 200 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 200 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 November 2021 373 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 November 2021 739 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 February 2018 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required