LOWRY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 514098
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Paul Woodcock Trustee 22 May 2019 None on record
ANN SALT Trustee 05 October 2017 None on record
LYNN HARMAN Trustee 21 May 2014 None on record
PAUL WILSON Chair 22 May 2019 None on record
MARTIN MAYNARD Trustee 23 September 2014 None on record
Joshua Thomas Macdonald Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record
Sharmila Christine Clarke Trustee 12 September 2019 None on record
Ryan Swailes Trustee 12 January 2017 None on record
James Andrew Samson Trustee 22 May 2019 None on record
JUSTIN MC DONNELL Trustee 24 June 2014 None on record
ADELA RAMSBOTTOM Trustee 12 December 2017 None on record