WELLINGTON THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 514385
Charity reporting is overdue by 588 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 223 days
Accounts and TAR 28 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 223 days
Annual return 28 June 2019 27 March 2021 333 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 June 2019 Overdue Overdue by 588 days
Annual return 28 July 2018 19 June 2019 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 27 July 2017 12 October 2018 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 June 2016 23 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 June 2016 Not Required