WELLINGTON THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 514385
Charity reporting is overdue by 586 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/06/2015 28/06/2016 27/07/2017 28/07/2018 28/06/2019
Total gross income £22.88k £24.97k £24.99k £17.70k £30.96k
Total expenditure £22.89k £27.77k £32.13k £21.09k £25.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A