SHETLAND RESCUE

Charity number: 514964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 November 2021 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 November 2021 29 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 November 2021 394 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 March 2021 136 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 May 2020 208 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 February 2018 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 19 February 2018 111 days late Download