SHETLAND RESCUE

Charity number: 514964
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £120.12k £80.57k £10.42k £29.55k £7.57k
Total expenditure £43.76k £43.59k £53.97k £43.35k £40.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A