Financial history HARROGATE SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 515127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £35.31k £35.72k £36.55k £34.76k £0
Total expenditure £36.99k £32.19k £44.04k £32.24k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A