Financial history TEES VALLEY ARTS

Charity number: 515369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £205.47k £112.10k £173.02k £175.08k £245.37k
Total expenditure £199.05k £188.53k £153.46k £189.62k £203.53k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £33.29k £16.68k £42.00k
Income from government grants £82.52k £38.49k £101.71k £23.93k £79.50k